HI HB2030 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 318, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1435).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 318, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1435).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motorists to "move over" when passing a stationary emergency vehicle on a highway. Requires driver to slow down to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe under the circumstances when an emergency road situation exists ahead of the driver. Defines "emergency vehicle". Exempts violation from proof of financial responsibility law. Provides for a violation if a violation does not involving death or bodily injury. Requires prosecution for existing applicable criminal offense for death or bodily injury. (SD1)
Title
Emergency Vehicle; Move Over
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 318, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1435). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 318, on 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1435). | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 711). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 708). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-20-12 | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Awana, Ichiyama, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 1:31PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-19-12 1:31PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 753). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Aquino, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Awana, Ichiyama, Fontaine. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 328). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ige). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-19-12. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Reported from TIA/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2834) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 118). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 911-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-12 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from TRN/PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Okamura, Saiki. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Okamura, Saiki. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/PBM on Wednesday, 02-01-12 10:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to TRN/PBM, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |