HI HB2031 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed marriage and family therapists to complete a minimum of forty-five hours of continuing education courses, including six hours in ethics courses, during each licensing renewal period, for the period beginning 1/1/2017, and thereafter. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Marriage and Family Therapists; Continuing Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Creagan, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 587) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3307) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2990) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-18-14 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 159). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2466 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Act 028, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).