HI HB2058 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the number of continuances a court may grant, absent good cause, for a show cause hearing in domestic abuse cases for temporary restraining orders. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Domestic Abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-03-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-20 2:00PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2305 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.