HI HB2088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 183, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 183, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a commercial property assessed financing program under the administration of the Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority. Allows commercial property owners to finance qualifying improvements through a non-ad valorem special property tax assessment. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Financing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 183, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 183, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 821). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-05-03 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-22. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2022-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 733) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3759) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Wakai. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3488) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 314). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Onishi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004-22) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, McDermott. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Matayoshi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3056 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Cesspool Upgrade and Conversion
Counties
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Property Assessed Financing
Property Resilience
Counties
Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority
Property Assessed Financing
Property Resilience