HI HB2094 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an early childhood educator stipend program to be administered by the executive office on early learning to address the shortage of qualified early childhood educators in Hawaii. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 7/1/2055. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Early Learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 62). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |