HI HB21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 196, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 196, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the board of directors of a condominium association to collect a six-month special assessment from the mortgagee or other purchaser of a unit with a recorded lien for delinquent common assessments. Specifies how excess rental income received by a condominium association shall be paid to existing lien holders. (CD1)
Title
Condominiums; Condominium Associations; Common Assessments; Liens
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 196, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 196, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cullen, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Yamane, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 464) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-03-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-02-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:50AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-19-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 158). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, McDermott voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, C. Lee. |
2013-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-13. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00 pm. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |