HI HB2100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 14
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 14
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides rebates for eligible electric vehicle-ready parking stalls for new construction of affordable housing. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 14 |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Electric Vehicle-ready Parking Stalls
HHFDC
Rebates
Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Electric Vehicle-ready Parking Stalls
HHFDC
Rebates