HI HB2154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes healthcare providers, non-profits, businesses, and faith based organizations to assist in providing Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) applications to prospective applicants in order to increase SNAP participation in Hawaii. (HB2154 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |