HI HB2219 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 118, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 118, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes eligible for membership on a county arborist advisory committee certified arborists, horticulturists with specialization in trees, and persons who have received a master's degree in botany. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 118, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 118, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2018-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2). |
2018-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 668). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 665). |
2018-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-27-18. |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Nishihara Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2018-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-23-18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2994) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 321). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |