HI HB2234 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates funds for the Judiciary to develop a three-year civil legal services pilot program to provide civil legal services at no cost to eligible parties. Requires reports to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Civil Legal Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |