HI HB2247 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that certain disclosure requirements for campaign advertisements apply to advertisements communicated by electronic or digital means. (HB2247 CD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recommitted to Conference Committee. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 60-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 60-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 447). |
2018-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 479) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-18. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 323). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-22-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |