HI HB2253 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Tarnas, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tam, Garcia.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Tarnas, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tam, Garcia.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to require all restaurants and hotel establishments to maintain an inventory of an opioid antagonist. Expressly permits law enforcement officers to carry an opioid antagonist while on-duty. Requires funds for the purchase of opioid antagonists used by law enforcement officers employed by a county to be paid for using county funds. Clarifies that emergency personnel and first responders may administer an opioid antagonist to an individual experiencing an opioid-related drug overdose. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi, Tarnas, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Takayama, Tam, Garcia. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2024-04-17 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, DeCoite. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:09AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN/WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama, Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-16-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:30 AM, House conference room 329. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |