HI HB2274 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the family court circuit of where a person resides is living, or is found, or in which the offense is alleged to have occurred to take jurisdiction for offenses concerning any person who is alleged to have committed an act before achieving eighteen years of age that would constitute a violation or attempted violation of any federal, state, or local law or county ordinance.
Title
Relating To Family Courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2274&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2274_.HTM |