HI HB2305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 132, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 132, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of Regional State Infrastructure Improvement Subaccounts within the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund and the use of the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund to provide loans and grants to finance regional state infrastructure improvements in areas of planned growth. (HB2305 CD1)
Title
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund; Regional State Infrastructure Improvement Subaccounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Act 132, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 132, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 56-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 56-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:06AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 10:06AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Jordan Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Harimoto Chair; Dela Cruz, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 596) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3495) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3063) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Green, Ihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 286). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-08-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2834 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.