HI HB2332 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code related to at-risk rules and deductions and to passive activity loss do not apply with respect to claims for the state low-income housing tax credit. Caps the state low-income housing tax credit at 50% of the federal low-income housing tax credit. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Nakamura, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3583) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3001) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-02-05 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-08-18 9:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2759 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to HOU, WAM.