HI HB2337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms chapter 236E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2013; and amends the definition of the applicable exclusion amount to close an existing loophole.
Title
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2887 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Act 044, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).