HI HB2337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Preserves the Employees' Retirement System's use and control of unclaimed member contributions and benefit payments.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2764 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2337&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2337_.HTM |