HI HB2342 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Continues the Nursing Facility Sustainability Program for one year. Appropriates funds out of the Nursing Facility Sustainability Program Special Fund for fiscal year 2016-2017. (HB2342 HD1)
Title
Nursing Facility Sustainability Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 02-16-16 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2871 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.