HI HB2353 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 079, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 079, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various positions within the state energy office exempt from civil service. For a period of three years, authorizes the department of health to establish 18 exempt forensic psychologist positions and 2 exempt Hawaii state hospital primary care physician positions. For a period of three years, provides a civil service exemption for various positions in the department of human services, department of public safety, and the department of health. (HB2353 CD1)
Title
Position Exemptions; Civil Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 079, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 079, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Morikawa, Ohno, Oshiro, Pouha, Say, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 167-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 167-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Aquino, Tupola. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 604) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Kidani, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3581) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3050) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K.Kahele ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Johanson, Jordan, Onishi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Takumi, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-05 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2016-02-02 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-04-16 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2882 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.