HI HB2361 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Community Development Authority to render services upon request to assist state and county agencies on projects within and outside designated community development districts. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 99-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 99-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Poepoe, Tarnas, Kila, Garrett, Ichiyama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:15AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 792). |
2024-04-19 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Poepoe, Tarnas, Kila Co-Chairs; Garrett, Ichiyama, Souza. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 683). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Moriwaki, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 587) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3768) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-05-24 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-20-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 352). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3050 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16