HI HB2363 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms county debt limit statements law to exclude tax increment bonds from the debt limit of the counties if a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of tax increment bonds and excluding tax increment bonds from determinations of the counties' funded debt is ratified.
Title
Relating To Tax Increment Bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3052 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2363&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2363_.HTM |