HI HB2378 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Moves the Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund into the state treasury. Repeals the Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund's authority to arrange the manner in which funds are held, invested, and reinvested. Makes a housekeeping amendment to the fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 140-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3067 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3).