HI HB2384 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 152, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 152, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates Uniform Controlled Substances Act for consistency with federal law. Allows prescription of drugs to patients undergoing medically managed withdrawal, also known as detoxification treatment and maintenance treatment, by practitioners who are properly registered. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 152, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 152, on 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2018-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696). |
2018-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3). |
2018-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2018-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nishimoto, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 832). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 720) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 333). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2811 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).