HI HB2403 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 120, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 120, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition of the medical advisory board. (SD1)
Title
Medical Advisory Board; Composition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 120, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 120, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 671). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-29-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 670). |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 669). |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 369). |
2016-03-29 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Nishihara, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-28-16. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2992) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Chun Oakland, English. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/TRE. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-17-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2932 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPH/TRE.