HI HB2405 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures driver license procedures are compliant with the Real ID Act.
Title
Driver License Renewal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2934 (Same As) 2016-04-26 - Act 015, on 04/25/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2405&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2405_.HTM |