HI HB2407 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for high-quality, integrated, meaningful arts education for students from kindergarten through grade 12. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB2407 HD1)
Title
Arts Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-12 at 11:40 am in conference room 329. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 2/6/12. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CUA on Saturday, 02-04-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to CUA, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |