HI HB2410 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 065, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 065, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor, on behalf of the State, to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the United States Department of Defense to enhance the State's relationship with the military and provide continued support for the military's presence in Hawaii. (HB2410 HD1)
Title
Support for Military Presence in Hawaii; Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (S) Act 065, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Act 065, on 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166). | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3309) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-12 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2846) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-12 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 204). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-02-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |