HI HB2434 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to access vital records for purposes of verifying Native Hawaiian ancestry for beneficiary programs. Requires the Department of Health and the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to enter into a Memorandum of Agreement to assure appropriate access and handling of confidential records and sealed records that have been unsealed pursuant to court order.
Title
Relating To Access To Vital Records For The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-09-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3123 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2434&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2434_.HTM |