HI HB2445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on JHA/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - The committee(s) on JHA/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to implement a post-market testing program to verify the labeling on cannabis and manufactured cannabis products and monitor the shelf lives of cannabis and manufactured cannabis products.
Title
Relating To The Testing Of Cannabis And Manufactured Cannabis Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JHA/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/AGR on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3134 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2445&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2445_.HTM |