HI HB2456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unlawful shipment of e-liquid products. Includes e-liquid and electronic smoking devices containing e-liquid within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Allocates a portion of funds collected from excise taxes on tobacco products to health education and prevention programs about the risks and dangers of the use of electronic smoking devices for youth. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to electronic smoking devices. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electronic Smoking Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Eliquid
Electronic Smoking Devices
Health Education and Prevention Programs
Taxation
Tobacco Products
Unlawful Shipment of E-liquid Products
Electronic Smoking Devices
Health Education and Prevention Programs
Taxation
Tobacco Products
Unlawful Shipment of E-liquid Products