HI HB2467 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and designates Flavobacterium akiainvivens as the official microbe of the State.
Title
State Microbe; Flavobacterium akiainvivens
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2). |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2467&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2467_.HTM |