HI HB2472 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for five additional labor law enforcement specialist positions in the department of labor and industrial relations to protect Hawaii employees' wages and enforce Hawaii's labor laws, including wage and hour laws on public works construction projects. Effective 7/1/2076. (SD2)
Title
Wage Standards Division; Positions; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 616) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3538) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3052) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura. |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2725 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JDL, WAM.