HI HB2475 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-26 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to address any situation where the condition of a regulated water carrier of cargo may result in the disruption, reduction, or cessation of essential services. Amends the bases upon which the Public Utilities Commission may issue a certificate of public convenience and necessity to an applicant seeking authority to serve as a regulated water carrier. Authorizes the Department of Transportation to enter into contracts to provide subsidies to a regulated water carrier provided the carrier meets certain conditions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cargo Carriers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3697) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 06-24-20 1:40PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 237). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, San Buenaventura, Todd voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-07-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2800 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Cargo Carriers
Department of Transportation
Public Utilities Commission
Receiver
Statutory Authority
Subsidies
Water Carriers;
Department of Transportation
Public Utilities Commission
Receiver
Statutory Authority
Subsidies
Water Carriers;