HI HB2538 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide education and support to local businesses regarding the federal Food and Drug Administration's industry guidance on colored sea salt. Requires Hawaii sea salt industries to collectively pay fifty per cent of the cost to conduct and submit to the federal Food and Drug Administration any research, studies, or analysis required for federal Food and Drug Administration approval of color additives used in Hawaii sea salt. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 602-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Matsumoto. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2098 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.