HI HB2542 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 192, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 192, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 684).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses the fiscal year 2010-2011 budget shortfall by transferring to the general fund various amounts of excess balances from certain special funds; amends the refundable credit of the Fuel Tax Credit for Commercial Fishers to be paid from the State Highway Fund. (HB2542 CD1)
Title
Transfer of Non-general Funds; Fuel Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 192, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 684). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 192, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 446). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 18 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Gabbard, Ihara . 7 No(es): Senator(s) Baker, Bunda, Fukunaga, Green, Hemmings, Ige, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 11:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 11:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-10 6:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-10 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-12-10 at 10:30AM in Conference Room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Saturday, 04-10-10 11:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 471). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 467). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 531). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Kim, Chair; Kidani, Kokubun. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Bunda, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Gabbard, Hooser, Ige . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 7 offered. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-29-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 201). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-17-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2695 (Same As) 2010-04-20 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 11:00AM in conference room 309.