HI HB2563 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Hawaii Convention Center from certain requirements regarding concessions on public property. Authorizes the Hawaii Tourism Authority to sell or lease naming rights for the Hawaii Convention Center facility. Facilitates advertising and marketing in and on the Hawaii Convention Center facility. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 106-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 106-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Kitagawa, La Chica, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 10:02AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 10:02AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 732). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Pierick added as Conferee. Representative Ward discharged as Conferee. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Garrett, La Chica, Ward. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 645) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3814) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Fevella. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 01-30-24 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |