HI HB26 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Act 133, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Act 133, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies how trustees shall be compensated. (HB26 CD1)
Title
Compensation of Trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Act 133, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). |
2015-06-23 | House | Act 133, on 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Luke, Johanson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Johanson, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-30-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 140). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 11:05AM in conference room 308. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-01-30 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Nakashima, Thielen. |
2015-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |