HI HB2617 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to petition the Land Use Commission to reclassify lands. Provides flexibility to the Land Use Commission in addressing violations of representations made to the Commission or conditions imposed by the Commission in the Commission's decisions and orders. Effective 7/1/2076. (SD2)
Title
State Land Use Commission; Zoning; Boundary Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 703). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard, Tokuda Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 618). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Rhoads as Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | House | Re-referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 629) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3550) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3041) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Inouye. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Wakai. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 159). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-22 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Pouha, Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |