HI HB2631 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - (H) Act 152, on 5/28/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - (H) Act 152, on 5/28/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Petroleum Industry Monitoring, Analysis, and Reporting Program, and its special fund; establishes the Energy Data Collection Program; requires refiners and distributors to report monthly to the Research and Economic Analysis Division of DBEDT, on fuel imported, exported, transferred, used, refined, manufactured, compounded, and distributed. Effective July 1, 2010. (HB2631 CD1)
Title
Petroleum Industry; Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | (H) Act 152, on 5/28/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 369). | |
2010-05-28 | (S) Act 152, 5/28/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 610). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Ige. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-22-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 10-10). | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-22-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 10-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Gabbard, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Herkes, Karamatsu, Coffman, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-16-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Herkes, Karamatsu, Coffman Co-Chairs; Ching. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Gabbard, Taniguchi, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 463) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from JGO/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3050) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Slom. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO/WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from CPN/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2782) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO/WAM. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Sakamoto. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hooser, Kokubun. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN/ENE, JGO/WAM. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 10:10AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to CPN/ENE, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 134). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Sagum. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Carroll, Herkes, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, Thielen. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Carroll, Ito, Karamatsu, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, Thielen. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-09-10 2:00 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Herkes, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Luke. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |