HI HB2635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes green infrastructure objectives and policies for state facility systems in the Hawaii State Planning Act to improve the quality of life for residents and visitors. Adds definition of "green infrastructure". Requires the office of planning, in partnership with the greenhouse gas sequestration task force, to submit a report to the legislature making recommendations for implementing the green infrastructure objectives, policies, and priority guidelines established by this measure. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 105). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |