HI HB2644 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the Hawaii Ant Lab in mitigating the effects of little fire ants in the State. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Little Fire Ants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 9:15AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Richards. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3772) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Fevella. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 422). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-09-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |