HI HB2661 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact to reduce barriers to teacher license portability and employment. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |