HI HB2668 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-12 at 5:41PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-12 at 5:41PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit to allow an additional fifteen per cent credit for drought mitigation from 1/1/2012 to 12/31/2020 and change the tax credit cap to $5,000,000 per year for the 2012 tax year and $7,000,000 per year for the 2013, 2014, and 2015 tax years, and $7,500,000 per year thereafter. Creates a livestock feed tax credit from 1/1/2012 to 12/31/2012. Creates livestock feed development tax credit from 1/1/2013 to 12/31/2014. Appropriates funds for staffing and consulting expenses. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Agriculture; Livestock Feed; Livestock Feed Development; Drought Mitigation; Tax Credit; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] |
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-12 at 5:41PM in Conference Room 229. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 2:05PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-12 11:45AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Riviere. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Espero, Slom. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 652) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3249) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2981) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 03-20-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 283). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-12 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Riviere. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-10-12 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-12. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-12 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |