HI HB2684 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Institute of Indigenous Education, Science, and Outreach within the University of Hawaii at Hilo. Provides that the Hawaiian language college revolving fund may include moneys from any revenue source and shall support the Imiloa astronomy center. Provides that the Hawaiian early learning trust fund shall support the Hawaiian language medium education pathway. Establishes a cap on individual deposits into the Hawaiian language college revolving fund and the Hawaiian early learning trust fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii At Hilo.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 430). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila, Ward. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 353-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-14-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marten. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-07-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2938 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM.
Subjects
College of Hawaiian Language
Hawaiian Early Learning
Hawaiian Language
Imiloa Astronomy Center
Institute of Indigenous Education, Science, and Outreach
UH
Hawaiian Early Learning
Hawaiian Language
Imiloa Astronomy Center
Institute of Indigenous Education, Science, and Outreach
UH