HI HB2702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that real estate investment trusts file returns reporting their shareholders' pro rata shares of net income and net income attributable to this State. Provides for composite returns and requires withholding for those shareholders who do not agree to file returns or pay tax on their pro rata share of net income attributable to this State. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. (HB2702 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 373). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-08-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |