HI HB2702 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for equipment and positions within the Department of Transportation to conduct improvements to Hana Highway. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Road Improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |