HI HB2739 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii home energy assistance program within the Department of Human Services to assist households in paying their energy bills. Establishes the Hawaii home energy assistance special fund. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 254-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3263 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
Department of Human Services
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Home Energy Assistance Program
Public Utilities Commission
Department of Human Services
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Home Energy Assistance Program
Public Utilities Commission