HI HB2747 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the annual contribution and deduction amounts, aggregate contribution amount, and deadline for distributing the entire interest for individual housing accounts established after 12/31/2018; allows community development financial institutions to serve as trustees of individual housing accounts established after 12/31/2018; and requires homebuyer education as a condition of distribution of funds in individual housing accounts by trustees. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Homeownership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Green, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Gates, Hashem, Todd, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 775) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3690) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3175) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 381). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:15PM in conference room 308. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-28-18. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |