HI HB285 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires county police departments to disclose to the Legislature the identity of an officer upon an officer's suspension or discharge beginning with the annual report of 2021. Amends the Uniform Information Practices Act to allow for public access to information about suspended officers when the suspension occurs after March 1, 2020. Takes effect 3/1/2020. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-19 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:30PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Baker, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 713) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1906) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 361).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LAB, JUD , referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback