HI HB2873 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - (S) Act 169, 6/27/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - (S) Act 169, 6/27/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Pacific international space center for exploration systems (PISCES) from the University of Hawaii to the department of business, economic development, and tourism's office of aerospace development. Establishes a PISCES board of directors. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | (S) Act 169, 6/27/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). | |
2012-06-27 | (H) Act 169, on 6/27/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 146-12). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 146-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Oshiro, Choy, Nakashima, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:10PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 4:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 4:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-20-12 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 759). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Tsuji. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Nakashima, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 673) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3305) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Reported from PGM/EDU/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2902) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/EDU/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to PGM/EDU/EDT, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Manahan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from ERB/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 615-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Mizuno, Takai, Wooley, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Saiki, Takumi, Ching. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-12 11:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB/HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-12. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB/HED on Tuesday, 02-07-12 11:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to ERB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading. |